Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Westhoven, Tom, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy 16: COPY CASE; |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -: MOTION HEARING; ACTUAL PROCEEDING TIME; |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment 14: JUDGMENT ON SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDING; S; 12 9 05064 0; |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order 13: AGREED ORDER RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
CP Supplemental Proceedings SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 12: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE -; THOMAS R WESTHOVEN; |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter 11: LETTER TO ATT RE LTD CTHSE SPACE; |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 10: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 03-09-2012CP; TO EXECUTION AND ORDER TO SHOW; CAUSE PURSUANT TO RCW 50.12.070; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.