Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mccollaum, Stephanie Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with STEPHANIE A AREND presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 1999 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedJune 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome Type06/04/2001 Uncontested Resolution06/04/2001 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | ARCHIVED RECORD | |
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MODIFICATION | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUPPORT WITH WORKSHEETS | |
November 05, 2007 | Hearing | None - None | |
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS FAMILY SUPPORT CALENDAR | |
September 21, 2007 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.