Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Kennison, Leslie Elaine, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with FAMILY COURT - 1 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2024 |
CategoryMinor Guardianship Custody |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2024 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW COURT - ONE (Rm. 217A) - None Confirmed |
|
April 03, 2024 | Hearing |
C5 - MINOR GUARDIANSHIP (Rm. 127 ) - 1:30 Minor Guardianship Hearing Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED COPY OF BIRTH CERTIFICATE | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | DCFS/CPS BACKGROUND INFORMATION | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM FAMILY COURT SERVICES | |
March 20, 2024 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 129 ) - Held Ex Parte Confirmed |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING DCYF TO RELEASE CPS INFORMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.