Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Fan, Sharon Chai Lai filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with BRYAN CHUSHCOFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2024 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2027 | Hearing | None - None | |
February 21, 2025 | Hearing |
DEPT 04 - JUDGE CHUSHCOFF (Rm. 2-E ) - None Confirmed |
|
March 06, 2024 | Hearing |
C1 - PROB/UNLAW DET/SUP PRO (Rm. 100 ) - 1:30 Guardianship/Probate Continued Confirmed |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | OATH | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED DATES OF BIRTH | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE ADDENDUM | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.