Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Cox, Steven Lee, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Tualatamalelagi, Aloiafi Selina, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Michael E. Schwartz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2024 |
CategoryParenting Plan\Child Support |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 03 - JUDGE SCHWARTZ (Rm. 822 ) - None Confirmed |
|
April 30, 2024 | Hearing |
C3 - SHOW CAUSE/FAMILY LAW (Rm. 407 ) - 9:00 Motion - Temporary Order Assignment to Set Trial Date Confirmed |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED FINANCIAL SOURCE DOCUMENT | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ALOIAFI TUALATAMALELAGI | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET PROPOSED | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | PROPOSED PARENTING PLAN | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL DECLARATION OF ALOIAFI TUALATAMALELAGI | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED FINANCIAL SOURCE DOCUMENT | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED FINANCIAL SOURCE DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.