Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Leonard, Lisa Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Doll, Jeffrey Leonard, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with GAROLD E. JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2024 |
CategoryDissolution With No Children |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome Type03/22/2024 Uncontested Resolution03/22/2024 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 10 - JUDGE JOHNSON (Rm. 2-C ) - 9:00 Assignment to Set Trial Date Confirmed |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LISA LEONARD | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL DECLARATION OF JEFF DOLL | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED FINANCIAL SOURCE DOCUMENT | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED FINANCIAL SOURCE DOCUMENT | |
April 03, 2024 | Hearing |
C3 - SHOW CAUSE/FAMILY LAW (Rm. 407 ) - Held - Motion Motion - Temporary Order Confirmed |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS CALENDAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.