Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Sawyer Trail Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Randall W. Redford, against Jones, Lakheata, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Philip K. Sorensen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2024 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 16, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 19 - JUDGE SORENSEN (Rm. 207A) - None Confirmed |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING OF MOTION FOR OSC, OSC & OA | |
March 18, 2024 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 127 ) - Held - Motion Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | COPY OF LEASE | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.