Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Abouelainin, Ahmed, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Adam Takeo Birnbaum, against Moore, Emanuel J, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Thomas Patrick Quinlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Patrick Quinlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2024 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 02, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 06 - JUDGE QUINLAN (Rm. 211A) - None Confirmed |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF E-MAILING OSC | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RE FORMATTED EXHIBIT A | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SERVICE RE: EVICTION NOTICE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ASSIGNING CASE TO DEPARTMENT AND SETTING HEARING DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.