Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Four Lakes Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Randall W. Redford, against Ayres, Tova, represented by Kathleen M Edelheit, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Angelica Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2024 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 18, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
March 19, 2024 | Hearing |
C1 - PROB/UNLAW DET/SUP PRO (Rm. 100 ) - 1:00 Eviction/Unlawful Detainer Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS CALENDAR | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND APPOINTING COUNSEL | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING OF MOTION FOR OSC, OSC & OA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.