Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Mhp, Oakridge Manor, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Adam Takeo Birnbaum, against Cornetta, Ryan, Rockwell, Christina, represented by John Roderick Kennedy Iii, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with KARENA KIRKENDOLL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2024 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 16, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND APPOINTING COUNSEL | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS CALENDAR | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OSC | |
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
C1 - PROB/UNLAW DET/SUP PRO (Rm. 100 ) - 1:00 Eviction/Unlawful Detainer Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 17 - JUDGE KIRKENDOLL (Rm. 214A) - None Confirmed |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.