Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Crown Properties Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Frederick L. Hetter Iii, against Fata, Uati, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Susan B. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2024 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 15, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
C1 - PROB/UNLAW DET/SUP PRO (Rm. 100 ) - 1:00 Eviction/Unlawful Detainer Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND APPOINTING COUNSEL | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS CALENDAR | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON APPLICABILITY OF CARES ACT | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.