Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Harwell, Jeff Blake, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Swift, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Outcome Type03/19/2024 Uncontested Resolution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER REISSUING TEMPORARY PROTECTION ORDER | |
April 02, 2024 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Continued Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
April 02, 2024 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDER FOR PROTECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.