Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
City Of Lakewood Police Dept, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2024 |
CategoryExtreme Risk Protection Order |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type02/16/2024 Uncontested Resolution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 02 - JUDGE ASHCRAFT (Rm. 202A) - 9:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | RECEIPT(S) SURRENDERED FIREARM | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JESSICA FITZGERALD POLICE SERGEANT CITY OF LAKEWOOD | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MELANIE PENNINGTON CITY OF LAKEWOOD | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | EX PARTE EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT | |
February 16, 2024 | Hearing |
DEPT 11 - JUDGE ADAMS (Rm. 304 ) - Held ER Protection Order Confirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.