Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Turnblom, Alexandria Christa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with ANDRE M. PENALVER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution With No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | Hearing | None - None | |
July 14, 2023 | Hearing |
DEPT 23 - JUDGE PENALVER (Rm. 531 ) - None Confirmed |
|
June 26, 2023 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 129 ) - Held - Motion Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DEFICIENCIES | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION DOCKET | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.