Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Caldon, Crystal Dawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with TaTeasha Monique Davis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution With No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Hearing |
DEPT 01 - JUDGE DAVIS (Rm. 323 ) - None Confirmed |
|
August 04, 2023 | Hearing |
C3 - PRO SE DISSOLUTION (Rm. 407 ) - 9:00 Dissolution Assignment to Set Trial Date Confirmed |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION DOCKET | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINDER | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: DEPENDENT OF MILITARY PERSON | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED $314.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.