Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Connect By American Family Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Corey A Kozachenko, against Witherow, Jerry T, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Stanley J. Rumbaugh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2023 |
CategoryTort Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 09, 2023 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 129 ) - 8:30 Exparte Action Mail Pretrial Conference Unconfirmed |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CONFIRMATION OF SERVICE PARTIES TO BE SERVED | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED $240.00 | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.