Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Rhodes, Kristi Rene, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rhodes, Michael Lee, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Protection |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type04/07/2023 Uncontested Resolution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RHODES | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT | |
April 20, 2023 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Continued Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REISSUING TEMPORARY PROTECTION ORDER | |
April 20, 2023 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF CAD INCIDENT REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.