Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Finkle, Phyllis filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with GAROLD E. JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
|
Case Outcome Type06/08/2021 Pers Rep/Guardian Appointed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2026 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PARTIAL RECEIPT | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT AND PENDENCY OF PROBATE | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO LAST WILL | |
June 08, 2021 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 129 ) - Held - Motion Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TESTIMONY | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL APPOINTING PERSONAL REP, ADJUDICATING SOLVENCY | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.