Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mccammon, Shervin R, Mccammon, Shervin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mccammon, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with James Orlando presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Orlando Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryLegal Separation With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome Type09/15/2022 Court Decision After Nj Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Hearing | None - None | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL DECLARATION | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL BRIEF | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |
August 29, 2022 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - UNCLAIMED | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - UNCLAIMED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.