Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Blakeslee, David J filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with KARENA KIRKENDOLL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
|
Case Outcome Type06/06/2018 Pers Rep/Guardian Appointed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
June 23, 2023 | Hearing | None - None | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE ADDENDUM | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY FEES | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEY CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
January 27, 2023 | Hearing | None - None | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.