Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kendrick, Gladys E. filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with EDMUND MURPHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
|
Case Outcome Type12/15/2017 Pers Rep/Guardian Appointed05/21/2018 Uncontested Completion |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | Hearing | None - None | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF COMPLETION | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF COMPLETION | |
May 15, 2018 | Hearing |
DEPT 09 - JUDGE MURPHY (Rm. 210A) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL APPOINTING PERSONAL REP, ADJUDICATING SOLVENCY | |
May 15, 2018 | Hearing |
DEPT 09 - JUDGE MURPHY (Rm. 260 ) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DEFICIENCIES | |
May 09, 2018 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 101 ) - Ex-Parte w/o Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.