Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pickering, Terry R filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Susan B. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
|
Case Outcome Type12/05/2017 Pers Rep/Guardian Appointed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Hearing |
DEPT 11 - JUDGE ADAMS (Rm. 304 ) - Fail to Appear-Party(ies) Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | REASSIGNMENT LETTER | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | REASSIGNMENT LETTER | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL APPOINTING PERSONAL REP, ADJUDICATING SOLVENCY | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT AND PENDENCY OF PROBATE | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | OATH | |
December 05, 2017 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 105 ) - Held Ex Parte Confirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.