Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maldonado, Teresa Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with KATHRYN J. NELSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome Type04/16/2018 Uncontested Resolution04/16/2018 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
April 27, 2018 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 129 ) - 8:30 Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW | |
April 16, 2018 | Hearing |
JUDGE NELSON (Rm. 315 ) - Cancelled/Stricken Assignment to Set Trial Date Confirmed |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION OF RESPONDENT | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DISSOLUTION | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION OF PETITIONER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.