Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ohman, Tamara Ruth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ohman, Ted Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with John R. Hickman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome Type07/12/2019 Court Decision After Nj Trial07/12/2019 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 26, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 14, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL ORDER | |
January 08, 2024 | Hearing | None - None | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL ORDER | |
October 27, 2023 | Hearing | None - None | |
October 12, 2023 | Hearing | None - None |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.