Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Czechowski, Liudmyla, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ashton K Dennis, against Davis, Elena, Davis, Jane John Doe, represented by Erika Nicole-Theresa Wunderlich, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with SUSAN K. SERKO presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryTort Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome Type12/05/2018 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial03/01/2019 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2019 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 18, 2018 | Hearing | None - None | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ALL CLAIMS | |
December 04, 2018 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 105 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
November 30, 2018 | Hearing |
JUDGE SERKO (Rm. 533 ) - Cancelled/Stricken Pretrial Conference Unconfirmed |
|
November 30, 2018 | Hearing |
JUDGE SERKO (Rm. 533 ) - Summary Judgment Held Motion - Motion(Other: PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT) Confirmed |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF FINAL PARTIAL JUDGMENT | |
November 30, 2018 | Hearing |
JUDGE SERKO (Rm. 533 ) - Cancel via Web-Issue resolved Motion - Motion(Other: EXTEND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE) Unconfirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.