Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Christopher Jason Mercado, against Williams, Carol, represented by Jonathan A. Baner, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with FRANK CUTHBERTSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryCollection |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome Type04/05/2018 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial02/11/2019 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 08, 2019 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 105 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 06, 2018 | Hearing |
JUDGE CUTHBERTSON (Rm. 2-E ) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ALL CLAIMS | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ASSIGNING CASE TO DEPARTMENT AND SETTING HEARING DATE | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED $240.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.