Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
B L, D C, D F, E J, E R, (total of 12) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Aaron Michael Young, Darrell L. Cochran, against Child Protective Services, Cornwell, Guy, Coumbs, Lee, Department Of Children Youth And Family Services, Department Of Social And Health Services, (total of 22) See All represented by Aaron Michael Young, Carl Edward Forsberg, Francis Stanley Floyd, Zachary David Rutman, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Timothy L. Ashcraft presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome Type01/26/2022 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
April 22, 2022 | Hearing | None - None | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAKOTA L. SOLBERG ISO RESPONSE | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | KIWANIS DEFS' RESPONSE IN OPP TO PLFS' MTN | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DARRELL L. COCHRAN | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE CR2A | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR JUDGES MOTION CALENDAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.