Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Soto Perez, Federico, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Shelly K Speir-Moss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2017 |
CategoryTort Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome Type02/15/2019 Summary Judgment02/15/2019 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2019 | Hearing | None - None | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK''S MINUTE ENTRY | |
February 15, 2019 | Hearing | None - None | |
January 18, 2019 | Hearing | None - None | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NANCY CANIFAX IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR JUDGES MOTION CALENDAR | |
December 06, 2018 | Hearing | None - None | |
November 22, 2018 | Hearing | None - None |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.