Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Roger Edward Rahlfs, against Lindley, Jessica M, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with THOMAS J. FELNAGLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2019 |
CategoryCollection |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome Type02/18/2014 Default Judgment02/18/2014 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT(WITH FEE) | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR GARNISHMENT | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT(WITH FEE) | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR GARNISHMENT | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ON ANSWER OF GARNISHEE DEFENDANT $2405.14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.