Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Soliday, Phillip, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Paul Alexander Lindenmuth, against Mulvahill, John Doe, Mulvahill, Kelly, Papa Murphys Pizza University Place, represented by Gordon G. Hauschild, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with RONALD E. CULPEPPER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome Type03/31/2015 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial04/09/2015 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 09, 2015 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ALL CLAIMS | |
March 31, 2015 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 17, 2015 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS/OPPOSITION TO ER 904 | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL *PARTIAL* - DISMISS PAPA MURPHY | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
March 11, 2015 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 105 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.