Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ah4R-Wa Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evan Lee Loeffler, against Gurno, Phylis, Woodin, Desirree, Woodin, Tina, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Jerry Costello presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome Type01/09/2014 Closed By Court Order Post-Hrg01/09/2014 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2014 | Hearing | None - None | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF RESTITUTION ISSUED | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR WRIT OF RESTITUTION | |
January 09, 2014 | Hearing |
JUDGE COSTELLO (Rm. 822 ) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT OR SWORN STATEMENT REQUIREMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.