Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Klotz, Roland, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Michael Wayne Johns, against Montoya, George, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with KATHERINE M. STOLZ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome Type12/31/2013 Closed By Court Order Post-Hrg12/31/2013 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2015 | Hearing | None - None | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
December 24, 2014 | Hearing |
C1 - PROB/UNLAW DET/SUP PRO (Rm. 100 ) - Held - Motion Supplemental Confirmed |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS WITH FEE | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION & AFFIDAVIT FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS CALENDAR | |
April 11, 2014 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 105 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
April 09, 2014 | Hearing |
JUDGE STOLZ (Rm. 214A) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.