Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dorland, Denise E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert P Schmitt, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Paul Lawrence Crowley, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with RONALD E. CULPEPPER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryTort Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome Type03/07/2016 Settled By Arbitration06/17/2016 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 24, 2016 | Hearing | None - None | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF ARBITRATION AWARD | |
June 03, 2016 | Hearing | None - None | |
May 20, 2016 | Hearing |
JUDGE CULPEPPER (Rm. 210A) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Ex Parte Confirmed |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RECESS LETTER | |
March 25, 2016 | Hearing |
JUDGE CULPEPPER (Rm. 210A) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE | |
March 18, 2016 | Hearing |
JUDGE CULPEPPER (Rm. 210A) - Continued Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RECESS LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.