Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pinnacle Credit Services Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Randall Dean Johannes, against Bernacchi, Stephen D, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with THOMAS J. FELNAGLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2018 |
CategoryForeign Judgment Type 2 |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome Type06/25/2013 Transfer Of Judgment06/25/2013 Completed When Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT(WITH FEE) | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR GARNISHMENT | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING JUDGMENT FILING FEE RECEIVED | |
February 27, 2018 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 101 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION TO EXTEND JUDGMENT | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT(WITH FEE) | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT | |
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.