Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Value Healthcare Management Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jason Anderson, against Haworth, Brandon K, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Rosanne Nowak Buckner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryCollection |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome Type04/19/2012 Default Judgment04/19/2012 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2012 | Hearing | None - None | |
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
July 12, 2012 | Hearing |
C1 - PROB/UNLAW DET/SUP PRO (Rm. 100 ) - Held - Motion Supplemental Confirmed |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION & AFFIDAVIT FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS WITH FEE | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR COMMISSIONERS CALENDAR | |
April 20, 2012 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 105 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.