Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Applegate, Karen, Applegate, Richard, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Justin David Bristol, against Galaxy Contractors Inc, Galligan, Joyce, Galligan, Terrence, represented by William Scott Noel, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with GAROLD E. JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome Type08/23/2012 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial08/31/2012 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2013 | Hearing | None - None | |
December 12, 2012 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 30, 2012 | Hearing |
DEPT 10 - JUDGE JOHNSON (Rm. 2-C ) - Cancelled/Stricken Pretrial Conference Unconfirmed |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ALL CLAIMS | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEY CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUB OF COUNSEL | |
May 23, 2012 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. JC1 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.