Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eb Bradley, West Coast Laminating Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brian M. Born, against Kniss, Jane Doe, Hillstrom Cabinets Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with THOMAS J. FELNAGLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome Type05/30/2008 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial05/30/2008 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT(WITH FEE) | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR GARNISHMENT | |
December 14, 2020 | Hearing | None - None | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ON ANSWER OF GARNISHEE DEFENDANT $5710.00 | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT \ | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.