Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Progressive Northwestern Insurance Co, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert Charles Scanlon, against Vigil, James T, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Rosanne Nowak Buckner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2019 |
CategoryTort Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome Type11/14/2008 Default Judgment11/14/2008 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT RE STIPULATION | |
October 15, 2018 | Hearing | None - None | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING JUDGMENT FILING FEE RECEIVED | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT SUMMARY | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 | |
October 11, 2018 | Hearing |
C4 - EXPARTE CALENDAR (Rm. 105 ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Exparte Action Mail Unconfirmed |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF COURT RECORD TO DOL | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT FOR INSTALLMENT PAYMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.