Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with BEVERLY G. GRANT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEVERLY G. GRANT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome Type12/06/2007 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial12/14/2007 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 14, 2007 | Hearing | None - None | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUPPORT WITH WORKSHEETS | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | RESIDENTIAL TIME SUMMARY REPORT | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DISSOLUTION | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | FINDINGS, OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ALL CLAIMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.