Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Watkins, Theresa Anastasia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Watkins, Zachary Tremain, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Beverly G. Grant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeverly G. Grant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome Type07/27/2007 Uncontested Resolution07/27/2007 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Hearing | None - None | |
October 04, 2018 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 28, 2018 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUPPORT WITH WORKSHEETS | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MODIFICATION | |
July 27, 2018 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW COURT - TWO (Rm. 207A) - Cancelled/Stricken Trial Confirmed |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS - PETITIONER'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.