Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Grant, Steven Michael, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Grant, Jennifer Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2006 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Protection |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type12/06/2006 Uncontested Resolution12/29/2006 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2006 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 105 ) - Cancelled/Stricken Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 15, 2006 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 105 ) - Continued Final Protection Order Unconfirmed |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF STEVEN M GRANT | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF DONNA ALLISON | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER REISSUING TEMPORARY PROTECTION ORDER | |
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED | |
December 06, 2006 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 105 ) - Held - Motion Ex Parte Unconfirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.