Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thompson, Zachary Dean, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case represented by Marianne Meeker, against Department Of Licensing, represented by Toni Marie Hood, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with KATHERINE M. STOLZ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2005 |
CategoryAdministrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Case Outcome Type07/13/2007 Dismissal Without Trial07/13/2007 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2007 | Hearing |
JUDGE STOLZ (Rm. 2-B ) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Motion - Dismiss Confirmed |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
October 27, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
December 16, 2005 | Hearing |
JUDGE STOLZ (Rm. 214A) - Cancelled/Stricken Motion - Motion Unconfirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.