Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with DeMelo, J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 1991 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: CONVERSION, C |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Continuation
Judge: CONVERSION, C |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Continuation
Judge: CONVERSION, C |
|
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation for the Appointment of | |
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Examination of Judgment Debtor
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: CONVERSION, C |
|
August 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service
Judge: CONVERSION, C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.