Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Winther, Cheryl, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cronin, Patrick Joseph, against Pend Oreille Apartments Llc, represented by Horey, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Robin R. McCroskey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF NON SERVICE |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons 60 DAYS |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons 30 DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.