Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Thomas, John M., against All Occupants & Persons, Gates, Larry, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Monasmith, Patrick A |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissal Hearing | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
DC Default Judgments and All Civil Matters SHOW CAUSE/UNLAWFUL DETAINER--1:30P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.