Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tuzil, Kevin, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Hansen, Kelle, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2018 |
CategoryWhc Writ Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes 13: COURT HEARING MINUTES 03/15; |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason HEARING STRICKEN: IN COURT OTHER; |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
DC Default Judgments and All Civil Matters CUSTODY REVIEW HEARING--1:30 PM |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 12: DECLARATION OF EXHIBITS; |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 11: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE 02/15; |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes 10: COURT HEARING MINUTES 02/14; |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Petition to Enforce Out of State Custody Order 9: ORD ON PET ENFRC OUT-STATE CUST ORD; 03-15-2018DC; CUSTODY REVIEW HEARING--1:30 PM; |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Warrant Other 8: WARRANT: IN AID OF WRIT OF HABEAS; |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order 7: ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OF CHILD; |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.