Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Leavitt, Christy, Shenefelt, Connie, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Montgomery, Chris Alan, against Glasgow-Bunting, Leisa, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 4: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 08-31-2017; SHOW CAUSE/UNLAWFUL DETAINER-1:30PM; |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 5: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 3: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 4: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 08-31-2017; SHOW CAUSE/UNLAWFUL DETAINER-1:30PM; |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons 2: SUMMONS; |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint 1: COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Montgomery, Chris Alan; |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.