Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hicks, Gregory Lawrence filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Philip J. Van de Veer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2015 |
CategoryPps Parenting Plan/Child Support |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice TO KEEP FILE OPEN |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice TO KEEP FILE OPEN |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Quashing Bench Warrant | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued Copy Filed | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Contempt Hearing | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.