Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Swartz, Jackie Joann filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2023 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM CLERK TO GRAYS HARBOR COUNTY CLERK |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Recusal of Judge | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Order for Protection | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Order for Protection | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Law Enforcement and Confidential Information Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.