Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fogerty, Hillary, Jolly, Charity, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Evans, Joseph William, against North River School District, No. 200, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply TO DISTRICT'S OPPOSITIN TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF SERVICE |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF RICK WINTERS IN SUPPORT OF DISTRICTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion PLAINTIFF'S CR 12 (c) FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer FROM: NORTH RIVER SCHOOL DISTRICT #200 |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.